VA HJR216 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-19 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ216ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-19 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ216ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Virginia Nurses Association. Commends the Virginia Nurses Association on its 25th Annual Nurses Day at the Virginia General Assembly.
Title
Commending the Virginia Nurses Association.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Dance [D] | Del. Scott Garrett [R] | Del. John O'Bannon [R] | Del. Christopher Peace [R] |
Del. David Toscano [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-19 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ216ER) | |
2010-02-18 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Received | |
2010-02-12 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2010-02-12 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2010-02-03 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 10104523D | |
2010-02-01 | House: Presented and laid on Speaker's table 10104523D |