VA HJR230 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-13)
Status: Passed on February 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-29 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ230ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-13)
Status: Passed on February 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-29 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ230ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Birthplace and Childhood Home of Edith Bolling Wilson. Recognizes the Town of Wytheville and Wythe County as the birthplace and childhood home of Edith Bolling Wilson, 35th First Lady of the United States and wife of President Woodrow Wilson.
Title
Wilson, Edith Bolling; General Assembly to recognize Birthplace and Childhood Home in Wythe County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-29 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ230ER) | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Reported from Rules by voice vote | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Reading waived | |
2012-02-03 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-03 | House: Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (94-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-03 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2012-02-03 | House: Taken up | |
2012-01-31 | House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-20 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2012-01-20 | House: Presented and ordered printed 12103751D |