VA HJR231 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-12 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ231ER)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-12 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ231ER)
Summary
Board of Game and Inland Fisheries resolution. Requests that the Board of Game and Inland Fisheries and the Department of Game and Inland Fisheries provide better communication and opportunities for public participation when proposing or changing regulations.
Title
Game and Inland Fisheries, Board of; public participation when proposing regulations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-12 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ231ER) | |
2008-02-28 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-28 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 087323712-S1 (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-27 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate with substitute | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HJ231S1 | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 087323712-S1 | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 087323712-S1 | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Reading waived | |
2008-01-25 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-01-25 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-25 | House: Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-25 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2008-01-25 | House: Taken up | |
2008-01-23 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-16 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2008-01-16 | House: Presented and ordered printed 084802712 |
Subjects
Commissions, Boards and Institutions Generally
Game, Inland Fisheries, and Boating
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Game, Inland Fisheries, and Boating
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HJ231 |