VA HJR232 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on February 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-03 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ232ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on February 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-03 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ232ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of F. Wayne McLeskey, Jr.
Title
Celebrating the life of F. Wayne McLeskey, Jr.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-03 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ232ER) | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Received | |
2012-01-27 | House: Agreed to by House | |
2012-01-27 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2012-01-23 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 12103810D | |
2012-01-20 | House: Presented and laid on Speaker's table 12103810D |