VA HJR247 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 53-31-2)
Status: Passed on March 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-01 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ247ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 53-31-2)
Status: Passed on March 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-01 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ247ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending MINDS WIDE OPEN: Virginia Celebrates Women in the Arts.
Title
Commending MINDS WIDE OPEN: Virginia Celebrates Women in the Arts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-01 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ247ER) | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Received | |
2010-02-19 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2010-02-19 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2010-02-12 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2010-02-10 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 10104805D | |
2010-02-08 | House: Presented and laid on Speaker's table 10104805D |