VA HJR310 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ310ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ310ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of the Honorable Kevin G. Miller, Sr.
Title
Celebrating the life of the Honorable Kevin G. Miller, Sr.
Sponsors
Del. Tony Wilt [R] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Del. Terry Austin [R] | Del. Robert Bell [R] |
Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Karrie Delaney [D] | Del. Todd Gilbert [R] | Del. Steve Heretick [D] |
Del. Keith Hodges [R] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. James Morefield [R] | Del. Robert Orrock [R] |
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. David Reid [D] | Del. Chris Runion [R] | Del. Lee Ware [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ310ER) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received |
2020-03-02 | House | Agreed to by House |
2020-03-02 | House | Engrossed by House |
2020-02-24 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 20108930D |