VA HJR334 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-08 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ334ER)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-08 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ334ER)
Summary
Celebrating the life of Seaman Freddie Neal Porter, Jr.
Title
Celebrating the life of Seaman Freddie Neal Porter, Jr.
Sponsors
Del. Terrie Suit [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-08 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ334ER) | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Received | |
2008-02-08 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-08 | House: Agreed to by House | |
2008-02-08 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2008-02-05 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 088739744 | |
2008-02-04 | House: Presented and laid on Speaker's table 088739744 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HJ334 |