VA HJR344 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-08 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ344ER)
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-08 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ344ER)
Summary
Celebrating the life of Staff Sergeant Jonathan Kilian Dozier.
Title
Celebrating the life of Staff Sergeant Jonathan Kilian Dozier.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-08 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ344ER) | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Received | |
2008-02-08 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-08 | House: Agreed to by House | |
2008-02-08 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2008-02-06 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 088933472 | |
2008-02-05 | House: Presented and laid on Speaker's table 088933472 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HJ344 |