VA HJR357 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ357ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ357ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the NASCAR Cup Series Food City Dirt Race at Bristol Motor Speedway.
Title
Commending the NASCAR Cup Series Food City Dirt Race at Bristol Motor Speedway.
Sponsors
Del. Israel O'Quinn [R] | Del. Jeffrey Campbell [R] | Del. Terry Kilgore [R] | Del. James Morefield [R] |
Del. William Wampler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ357ER) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Received |
2022-03-08 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2022-03-08 | House | Engrossed by House |
2022-03-04 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 22106975D |