VA HJR8 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Department of Transportation; purchase of the Dulles Greenway; report. Requests the Department of Transportation to study the feasibility of purchasing all or part of the Dulles Greenway.
Title
Dulles Greenway; purchase of Greenway by VDOT.
Sponsors
Sen. John Bell [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Rules |
2018-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 3-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-12-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-12-14 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102997D |