VA HJR92 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ92ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ92ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Office of Drinking Water; Commonwealth's drinking water infrastructure and oversight of the drinking water program; report. Requests the Office of Drinking Water of the Department of Health to study the Commonwealth's drinking water infrastructure and oversight of the drinking water program. In conducting its study, the Office shall (i) identify problems or issues that may result in contamination of drinking water with lead, copper, or other substances or organisms or increase the likelihood of contamination of drinking water with lead, copper, or other substances or organisms and (ii) develop recommendations for addressing such problems or issues.
Title
Drinking water program; Off. of Drinking Water/Dept. of Health to study infrastructure & oversight.
Sponsors
Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (87-Y 5-N) (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (87-Y 5-N) (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ92ER) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading waived |
2020-02-10 | House | VOTE: Agree To (87-Y 5-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Agreed to by House (87-Y 5-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House |
2020-02-10 | House | Taken up |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101663D |