VA SB111 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0228)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0228)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Drug Control Act; Schedule I; Schedule II; Schedule IV; Schedule V. Adds certain chemicals to Schedules I, II, IV, and V of the Drug Control Act. The Board of Pharmacy has added these substances in an expedited regulatory process. A substance added via this process is removed from the schedule after 18 months unless a general law is enacted adding the substance to the schedule.
Title
Drug Control Act; adds certain chemicals to Schedules I, II, IV, and V of Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0228) | |
2024-03-28 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 228 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB111ER) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-27 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-27 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-27 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-26 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-22 | House | Reported from Health and Human Services (21-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2024-02-16 | House | Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-15 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102045D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1333 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0062)
HB1450 (Similar To) 2024-01-30 - Incorporated by Health and Human Services
HB1450 (Similar To) 2024-01-30 - Incorporated by Health and Human Services
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 3446 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3448 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3452 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3454 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |