VA HB1450 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-30 - Incorporated by Health and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-30 - Incorporated by Health and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Drug Control Act; Schedule I; Schedule II; Schedule IV; Schedule V. Adds certain chemicals to Schedules I, II, IV, and V of the Drug Control Act. The Board of Pharmacy has added these substances in an expedited regulatory process. A substance added via this process is removed from the schedule after 18 months unless a general law is enacted adding the substance to the schedule.
Title
Drug Control Act; adds certain chemicals to Schedules I, II, IV, and V of Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-30 | House | Incorporated by Health and Human Services |
2024-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2024-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24105240D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1333 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0062)
SB111 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0228)
SB111 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0228)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 3446 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3448 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3452 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3454 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |