VA SB1161 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Coal tax credits. Limits the aggregate amount of credits that may be allocated or claimed for the coal employment and production incentive tax credit to $7.5 million. An electricity generator must file an application with the Department of Taxation each year to determine the amount of credits that it may claim or allocate, including credits earned in prior taxable years. If the total amount of credits earned in a taxable year exceeds $7.5 million, the Department of Taxation shall apportion the credits on a pro rata basis. The bill also extends the sunset date of the coalfield employment enhancement tax credit through taxable year 2019.
Title
Coal tax; limits amount of credit that may be claimed for coal employment and production incentive.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Motion to pass in enrolled form rejected (23-Y 16-N) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (16-Y 23-N) (Y: 16 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (66-Y 31-N 1-A) (Y: 68 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (29-Y 9-N) (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (16-Y 23-N) (Y: 16 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (66-Y 31-N 1-A) (Y: 68 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (29-Y 9-N) (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Communicated to Governor |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Requires 27 affirmative votes to pass in enrolled form |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Motion to pass in enrolled form rejected (23-Y 16-N) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (16-Y 23-N) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2015-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/25/15 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1161ER) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Title replaced 15105148D-H2 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (66-Y 31-N 1-A) |
2015-02-18 | House | Passed House with substitute (66-Y 31-N 1-A) |
2015-02-18 | House | Engrossed by House - floor substitute SB1161H2 |
2015-02-18 | House | Substitute by Delegate Kilgore agreed to 15105148D-H2 |
2015-02-18 | House | Committee substitute rejected 15105024D-H1 |
2015-02-18 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-18 | House | Floor substitute printed 15105148D-H2 (Kilgore) |
2015-02-17 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-16 | House | Committee substitute printed 15105024D-H1 |
2015-02-16 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 7-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (29-Y 9-N) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1161S1 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104639D-S1 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104639D-S1 |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103375D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1879 (Same As) 2015-04-30 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor