VA SB12 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0779)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0779)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Children's advocacy centers; definitions; investigations by local departments of social services. Replaces the term "child advocacy center" with "children's advocacy center" and defines such term. The bill provides that if it is determined during a human trafficking assessment that a forensic interview of the child is needed, such interview may be conducted by a children's advocacy center within the jurisdiction; however, if the interview cannot be completed within 14 days, the forensic interview may be conducted by a children's advocacy center located in another jurisdiction.
Title
Children's advocacy centers; definitions, investigations by local departments of social services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - House - House: BLOCK VOTE: (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (72-Y 26-N) (Y: 72 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (72-Y 26-N) (Y: 72 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0779) | |
2024-04-17 | House | Enacted, Chapter 779 (effective 7/1/24) |
2024-04-17 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB12ER2) |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2024-04-17 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2024-04-17 | House | BLOCK VOTE: (97-Y 0-N) |
2024-04-17 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2024-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 1, 2024 |
2024-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB12ER) |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-20 | House | VOTE: Passage (72-Y 26-N) |
2024-02-20 | House | Passed House (72-Y 26-N) |
2024-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-15 | House | Reported from Health and Human Services (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 24100736D-E |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB12E |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-01-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-11-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2023-11-21 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100736D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1128 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0829)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 1627.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1505 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1506.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |