VA SB127 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-10 - Senate: Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-10 - Senate: Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Sex offender registry; juvenile registration. Requires registration on the sex offender registry for juveniles who were over the age of 13 at the time of the offense who were adjudicated delinquent on or after July 1, 2012, of rape, forcible sodomy, or object sexual penetration. Information on juveniles adjudicated delinquent does not have to be made available on the public website. A second enacting clause provides that the bill will not become effective unless an appropriation of general funds effectuating the purposes of the bill is included in the general appropriation act passed by the 2012 Regular Session of the General Assembly and signed by the Governor and becomes law.
Title
Sex offender registry; juvenile registration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (4-Y 36-N) (Y: 4 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (71-Y 23-N) (Y: 73 N: 23 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 4-N) (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 4-N) (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (4-Y 36-N) (Y: 4 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (71-Y 23-N) (Y: 73 N: 23 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 4-N) (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 4-N) (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-10 | Senate: Failed to pass in Senate | |
2012-03-10 | Senate: No further action taken | |
2012-03-08 | House: Delegates: Albo, Bell, Robert B, Johnson | |
2012-03-08 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Senators: Stanley, Vogel, Reeves | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 1-N) | |
2012-03-07 | House: House requested conference committee | |
2012-03-07 | House: House insisted on substitute | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (4-Y 36-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (71-Y 23-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Passed House with substitute (71-Y 23-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB127H1 | |
2012-03-05 | House: Amendments by Delegate Morrissey rejected | |
2012-03-05 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12105540D-H1 | |
2012-03-05 | House: Read third time | |
2012-03-02 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-29 | House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-29 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-28 | House: Assigned App. sub: Public Safety | |
2012-02-21 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-21 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 4-N) | |
2012-02-21 | House: Reconsidered by Courts of Justice | |
2012-02-20 | House: Committee substitute printed 12105540D-H1 | |
2012-02-20 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 4-N) | |
2012-02-16 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-02-16 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB127S2 | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12105206D-S2 | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Committee substitute rejected 12104571D-S1 | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-07 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12105206D-S2 | |
2012-02-07 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (11-Y 4-N) | |
2012-01-24 | Senate: Incorporates SB412 | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12104571D-S1 | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 6-N) | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103350D |
Same As/Similar To
SB412 (Similar To) 2012-01-23 - Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice