VA SB134 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Juvenile and domestic relations district courts; Department of Juvenile Justice; extending jurisdiction in delinquency matters to persons 18 years of age or older but less than 21 years of age. Raises the maximum age for delinquency matters in juvenile and domestic relations district courts from persons under 18 years of age to persons under 21 years of age. The bill defines "underage person" as an individual who is 18 years of age or older but less than 21 years of age. The bill adds underage persons to all provisions regarding delinquency proceedings in juvenile and domestic relations district courts, the transfer of delinquency matters to circuit courts, and criminal procedure as currently applies to juveniles only. The bill differentiates between juveniles and underage persons in specific circumstances, including consent for medical or mental health records or procedures, mental health screenings in secure detention facilities, and provisions regarding release on bail or recognizance. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2024, and provides that the provisions of the bill shall apply prospectively and only to conduct or an offense that occurs on or after January 1, 2024. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act. Juvenile and domestic relations district courts; Department of Juvenile Justice; extending jurisdiction in delinquency matters to persons 18 years of age or older but less than 21 years of age. Raises the maximum age for delinquency matters in juvenile and domestic relations district courts from persons under 18 years of age to persons under 21 years of age. The bill defines "underage person" as an individual who is 18 years of age or older but less than 21 years of age. The bill adds underage persons to all provisions regarding delinquency proceedings in juvenile and domestic relations district courts, the transfer of delinquency matters to circuit courts, and criminal procedure as currently applies to juveniles only. The bill differentiates between juveniles and underage persons in specific circumstances, including consent for medical or mental health records or procedures, mental health screenings in secure detention facilities, and provisions regarding release on bail or recognizance. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2024, and provides that the provisions of the bill shall apply prospectively and only to conduct or an offense that occurs on or after January 1, 2024. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.
Title
Juvenile and domestic relations district courts; raises maximum age for delinquency matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendments (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendments (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2022-02-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-27 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 22100118D-E |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB134E |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with amendments (9-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Assigned Judiciary sub: Criminal Law |
2022-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100118D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 228 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 241 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 242 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 243 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 247 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 248.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 249 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 250 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 254 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 255 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 256 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 259 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 263 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 272 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 273 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 274.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 274.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 277.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 278.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 278.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 278.8:01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 280 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 284 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 284.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 285 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 287 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 291 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 292 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 293 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 295 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 296 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 297 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 299 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 299.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 309.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 356 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 360 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |