VA SB135 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0379)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0379)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority; eligible site for site development grant; minimum acreage requirement. Provides that the Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority may determine a site of at least 50 contiguous acres to be an eligible site if such site meets certain criteria provided in the bill to receive a site development grant from the Virginia Business Ready Sites Program Fund.
Title
Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority; eligible site for site development grant.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Head [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0379) | |
2024-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 379 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 27, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB135ER) |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-07 | House | VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-07 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-07 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2024-03-05 | House | Delegates: Reid, Willett, Campbell |
2024-03-05 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senators: Head, Bagby, Aird |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-29 | House | House requested conference committee |
2024-02-29 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2024-02-28 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) |
2024-02-26 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-26 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-26 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB135H1 |
2024-02-26 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24108051D-H1 |
2024-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-23 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-21 | House | Committee substitute printed 24108051D-H1 |
2024-02-21 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB135S1 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24105425D-S1 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24105425D-S1 |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103042D |
Same As/Similar To
HB233 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0378)