VA SB193 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0785)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0785)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Medicaid provider agreements; authority to terminate. Allows the Director of the Department of Medical Assistance Services to refuse to enter into or renew, or elect to terminate an existing provider agreement or contract for any of the reasons the U.S Secretary of Health and Human Services may do the same, and makes clear that in cases in which a contract or agreement is terminated, the provider shall be entitled to an appeal of the decision, and that the director may consider aggravating or mitigating factors in determining the period of exclusion when a contract is terminated. This bill also requires the promulgation of emergency regulations.
Title
Medicaid provider agreements; Director of Medical Assistance Services has authority to terminate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0785) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Enacted, Chapter 785 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB193ER2) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2010-04-21 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-20 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-04-13 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2010-03-13 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-11 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB193ER) | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Title replaced 10105502D-H1 | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-01 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-01 | House: Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-01 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB193H1 | |
2010-03-01 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10105502D-H1 | |
2010-03-01 | House: Read third time | |
2010-02-26 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-25 | House: Committee substitute printed 10105502D-H1 | |
2010-02-25 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-23 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-19 | House: Assigned HWI sub: #3 | |
2010-02-03 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2010-02-03 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-03 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-01-26 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 10101255D-E | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB193E | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-01-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-21 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101255D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 325 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 325.1:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |