VA SB207 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0581)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0581)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Universal certification for certain law-enforcement officers. Provides that any sworn law-enforcement officer with at least one year of experience (i) whose training qualifications meet or exceed current training standards established by the Board of Criminal Justice Services and who is in compliance with the minimum qualifications, (ii) who has not had a break in service of more than 24 months, and (iii) who is leaving the transferring agency in good standing with no pending investigations or disciplinary actions shall be eligible for employment at any law-enforcement agency within the Commonwealth or its political subdivisions. Prior to any conditional offer of employment, the bill requires the hiring law-enforcement agency to request certain specified information from all prior law-enforcement agencies and to employ all reasonable means to obtain personnel records for law-enforcement officers transferring from an out-of-state or federal law-enforcement agency. The bill requires that upon the receipt of all requested information by the hiring law-enforcement agency, the applicant law-enforcement officer shall complete a sworn declaration that the provided information or records are, to the best of the applicant's knowledge, a true, correct, and complete response to such request.
Title
Law-enforcement officers, certain; universal certification, necessary training.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee substitute reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee substitute reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0581) | |
2024-04-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 581 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 27, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB207ER) |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-09 | House | VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-09 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 24109136D-S3 |
2024-03-08 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2024-03-06 | House | Delegates: Sullivan, Clark, Wilt |
2024-03-06 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senators: Surovell, Boysko, Diggs |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-04 | House | House requested conference committee |
2024-03-04 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2024-03-01 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB207H1 |
2024-02-28 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24108223D-H1 |
2024-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-23 | House | Committee substitute printed 24108223D-H1 |
2024-02-23 | House | Reported from Public Safety with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB207S2 |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Surovell agreed to 24106602D-S2 |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 24106122D-S1 |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 24106602D-S2 (Surovell) |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24106122D-S1 |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24106122D-S1 |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Moved from Judiciary to Courts of Justice due to a change of the committee name |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103540D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1022 (Similar To) 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0542)