VA SB213 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0882)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0882)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Medical Assistance Services; study; Personal Maintenance Allowance and impact on employment. Directs the Department of Medical Assistance Services to establish a work group to evaluate the current Personal Maintenance Allowance amount for individuals receiving Medicaid-funded waiver services and the impact of the current Personal Maintenance Allowance amount and other income limits on the ability of Medicaid waiver service recipients to engage in meaningful work and establish and maintain independence. The work group shall report its findings and conclusions to the Governor, the General Assembly, and the Chairman of the Joint Commission on Health Care by November 1, 2020.
Title
Personal Maintenance Allowance; DMAS to establish work group to evaluate current amount.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0882) | |
2020-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 882 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB213ER) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-03 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-03 | House | Read third time |
2020-03-02 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-12-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-12-30 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101420D |