VA SB221 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Covenants regarding natural drying devices. Provides that effective July 1, 2010, no community association shall prohibit an owner from installing or using a natural drying device on that owner's property. The bill provides that a community association may establish reasonable restrictions concerning the size, placement, duration, and manner of placement of such natural drying device.
Title
Natural drying devices; no community association shall prohibit owner from installing or using.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-14 | House: Left in General Laws | |
2010-02-24 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N) | |
2010-02-23 | House: Assigned GL sub: #1 Housing | |
2010-02-03 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2010-02-03 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-03 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-01-26 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 10100615D-E | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB221E | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-01-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-20 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100615D |