VA SB221 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0171)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0171)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School boards and local law-enforcement agencies; memorandums of understanding; frequency of review and public input. Shortens from every five years to every two years the frequency of the review period for memorandums of understanding between school boards and local law-enforcement agencies. The bill also requires local school boards to conspicuously publish the current division memorandum of understanding on its division website and provide notice and opportunity for public input during each memorandum of understanding review period.
Title
School boards and local law-enforcement agencies; memorandums of understanding, frequency of review.
Sponsors
Sen. Mamie Locke [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (86-Y 11-N) (Y: 86 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Education (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Education (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0171) | |
2020-03-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 171 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 6, 2020 | |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 28, 2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB221ER) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-20 | House | VOTE: Passage (86-Y 11-N) |
2020-02-20 | House | Passed House (86-Y 11-N) |
2020-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-17 | House | Reported from Education (19-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20103258D-E |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB221E |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2019-12-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-12-30 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103258D |
Same As/Similar To
HB292 (Same As) 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0052)