VA SB230 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0014)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0014)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Commonwealth's tax code; conformity with federal law; emergency. Advances conformity of the Commonwealth's tax code with the federal tax code to February 9, 2018. The bill conforms only to certain provisions of Public Law 115-97, known as the "Tax Cuts and Jobs Act," that affect taxable years prior to 2018. The bill conforms to provisions creating an incentive for taxpayers to make contributions to hurricane relief efforts and certain other provisions. The bill also conforms to provisions of Public Law 115-123, known as the "Bipartisan Budget Act of 2018," that affect taxable year 2017. The bill contains an emergency clause and is identical to HB 154.
Title
Commonwealth's tax system; conformity with federal law, emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0014) | |
2018-02-22 | House | Enacted, Chapter 14 (effective 2/22/18) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2018-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB230ER2) |
2018-02-22 | House | Reenrolled |
2018-02-22 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2018-02-22 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-22 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2018-02-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 22, 2018 | |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/15/18 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB230ER) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-12 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-07 | House | Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB230S1 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18104836D-S1 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18104836D-S1 |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/10/18 18101788D |