VA SB230 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0866)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0866)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Grantor's tax and regional transportation improvement fee. Provides that, for purposes of the grantor's tax and regional transportation improvement fee (the regional WMATA capital fee), the grantor and grantee may arrange that the grantee pay all or a portion of the tax or fee. Current law requires the grantor to pay the tax or fee.
Title
Grantor's tax and regional transportation improvement fee; payment of tax or fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0866) | |
2020-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 866 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB230ER) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-27 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-27 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-27 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-26 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-24 | House | Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-02-18 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Moved from Finance to Finance and Appropriations due to a change of the committee name |
2020-01-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-01 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102139D |