VA SB241 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0717)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0717)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Renal Disease Council; report. Creates the Renal Disease Council for the purpose of (i) advising the Governor and the General Assembly on the needs of individuals with renal disease in the Commonwealth; (ii) identifying challenges that such individuals face and making recommendations for the improvement of the Commonwealth's kidney care system, particularly related to care coordination and prevention; (iii) funding research related to renal disease; (iv) funding supports for persons with renal disease in the Commonwealth; and (v) developing programs to educate medical professionals and the public about renal disease. Renal Disease Council; report. Creates the Renal Disease Council for the purpose of (i) advising the Governor and the General Assembly on the needs of individuals with renal disease in the Commonwealth; (ii) identifying challenges that such individuals face and making recommendations for the improvement of the Commonwealth's kidney care system, particularly related to care coordination and prevention; (iii) funding research related to renal disease; (iv) funding supports for persons with renal disease in the Commonwealth; and (v) developing programs to educate medical professionals and the public about renal disease.
Title
Renal Disease Council; created, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (80-Y 20-N) (Y: 80 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (77-Y 19-N) (Y: 77 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 37-N) (Y: 2 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (75-Y 20-N) (Y: 75 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (77-Y 19-N) (Y: 77 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 37-N) (Y: 2 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (75-Y 20-N) (Y: 75 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0717) | |
2022-04-27 | House | Enacted, Chapter 717 (effective 7/1/22) |
2022-04-27 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB241ER2) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2022-04-27 | House | VOTE: Adoption (80-Y 20-N) |
2022-04-27 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (80-Y 20-N) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Governor's substitute printed 22108008D-S1 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB241ER) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-11 | House | VOTE: Adoption (77-Y 19-N) |
2022-03-11 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (77-Y 19-N) |
2022-03-11 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2022-03-10 | House | Delegates: Head, Wachsmann, Guzman |
2022-03-10 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senators: Hashmi, Ebbin, Cosgrove |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | House requested conference committee |
2022-03-09 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2022-03-08 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 37-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | VOTE: Passage (75-Y 20-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | Passed House with substitute (75-Y 20-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB241H1 |
2022-03-07 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22107255D-H1 |
2022-03-07 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-04 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-02 | House | Committee substitute printed 22107255D-H1 |
2022-03-02 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-24 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (17-Y 5-N) |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (10-Y 5-N) |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22104032D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 73.18 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 73.21 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |