VA SB250 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1161)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1161)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Medicare supplement policies for certain individuals under age 65. Requires each insurer issuing Medicare supplement policies or certificates in the Commonwealth to offer the opportunity of enrolling in at least one of its issued Medicare supplement policies or certificates to any individual under age 65 who resides in the Commonwealth, is enrolled in Medicare Part A and B, and is eligible for Medicare by reason of disability. The provisions of the measure are applicable to health plans and health maintenance organizations.
Title
Medicare; supplement policies for certain individuals under age 65.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1161) | |
2020-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1161 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB250ER) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-25 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-24 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-20 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB250S1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20105841D-S1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20105841D-S1 |
2020-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-01-02 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100980D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 3610 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4214 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4319 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |