VA SB258 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0804)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0804)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Persons permitted to work in mines; age requirements. Removes the provision prohibiting persons under 18 years of age from working around any mine and requires the Department of Mines, Minerals and Energy to conform its regulations to federal law with respect to such age requirements. The bill does not affect the existing provision prohibiting persons under 18 years of age from working in any mine.
Title
Persons permitted to work in mines; age requirements, no person under 18 yrs. of age.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 2-N) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 2-N) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0804) | |
2020-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 804 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB258ER) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-03 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | VOTE: Passage (98-Y 2-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | Passed House with amendments (98-Y 2-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2020-03-02 | House | Amendments by Delegate Levine agreed to |
2020-03-02 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-28 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-25 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment (20-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2020-01-03 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103072D |