VA SB291 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0361)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0361)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Motor Vehicles; electronic services. Codifies existing budget language in Item 442 A of the 2017 Appropriation Act that authorizes the Department of Motor Vehicles to establish, where feasible and cost efficient, contracts with public-private partnerships to provide for simplification and streamlining of services through electronic means. The bill codifies electronic services that the Department of Motor Vehicles has created pursuant to existing budget authority to provide simple, fast, efficient, and secure titling and registration of vehicles for customers and lienholders.
Title
Motor Vehicles, Department of; electronic services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0361) | |
2018-03-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 361 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-06 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018 |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB291ER) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-27 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-27 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-27 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-26 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-22 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-16 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101543D |