VA SB348 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - Incorporated by General Laws and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - Incorporated by General Laws and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Gaming; posting of illegal gaming tip line information. Requires those legally authorized to sell Virginia lottery tickets or conduct charitable gaming, horse racing with pari-mutuel wagering, and casino gaming in the Commonwealth to post in a conspicuous place on their premises a sign that bears the toll-free telephone number and website of the illegal gaming tip line established and administered by the Office of the Gaming Enforcement Coordinator in the Department of State Police for members of the public to report concerns about, or suspected instances of, illegal gaming activities.
Title
Gaming; posting of illegal gaming tip line information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Incorporated by General Laws and Technology (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | Senate | Incorporated by General Laws and Technology |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Assigned GL&T sub: Gaming |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101186D |
Same As/Similar To
SB397 (Similar To) 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0593)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 340.19 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4007.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4122.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 369 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |