VA SB35 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Comprehensive plan approval. Allows a planning commission to extend the 60-day period during which it makes a recommendation to the governing body on a comprehensive plan amendment if an applicant agrees to such extension. The bill also allows the extension to such longer period as agreed to by an applicant of the period of time during which the governing body shall hear and determine an appeal from a planning commission decision. Comprehensive plan approval. Allows a planning commission to extend the 60-day period during which it makes a recommendation to the governing body on a comprehensive plan amendment if an applicant agrees to such extension. The bill also allows the extension to such longer period as agreed to by an applicant of the period of time during which the governing body shall hear and determine an appeal from a planning commission decision.
Title
Comprehensive plan approval; appeal shall be heard and determined within 60 days, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (53-Y 45-N) (Y: 53 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2022-03-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-03-09 | House | VOTE: Agree To (53-Y 45-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | Motion to refer to committee agreed to (53-Y 45-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-08 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (18-Y 4-N) |
2022-03-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2022-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 22100996D-E |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB35E |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with amendment (13-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2021-12-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2021-12-26 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100996D |