VA SB377 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-30 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-30 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Construction projects using public funds; iron, steel, and manufactured goods must be produced in the United States. Prohibits use of state funds for construction projects, including any construction, alteration, maintenance, or repair of a public building or public works project, unless all of the iron, steel, and manufactured goods, including equipment, used in the project are produced in the United States. Under the bill an exception to the requirement is provided if the administrative head of the contracting state agency determines in writing that (i) iron, steel, and relevant manufactured goods are not produced in the United States in sufficient and reasonably available quantities and of a satisfactory quality or (ii) inclusion of iron, steel, and manufactured goods produced in the United Sates will increase the costs of the overall project by more than 25 percent.
Title
Construction projects using public funds; iron, steel, manufactured goods must be produced in USA.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2013 in Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-30 | Senate | Left in Finance |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Continued to 2013 in Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2012-02-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2012-02-13 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (13-Y 2-N) |
2012-01-24 | Senate | Assigned GL&T sub: #2 |
2012-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2012-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103760D |