VA SB465 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0139)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0139)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Request for Proposal of design-build projects. Allows for the submission and consideration of alternative technical concepts, defined in the bill, during the Request for Proposal process of a design-build transportation project.
Title
Request for Proposal of design-build projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0139) | |
2016-03-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 139 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 1, 2016 | |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/23/16 |
2016-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB465ER) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-02-22 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-18 | House | Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 16103482D-E |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB465E |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with amendment (13-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103482D |
Same As/Similar To
HB501 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0369)