VA SB474 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requirement for appeals bond; indigent parties; appeal of unlawful detainer. Removes the requirement for an indigent defendant, as defined in the bill, to post an appeal bond in an unlawful detainer action appealed from the general district court.
Title
Appeals bond; removes requirement for indigent parties to post, appeal of unlawful detainer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (65-Y 35-N) (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 8-N) (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (65-Y 35-N) (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 8-N) (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2022-04-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., May 27, 2022 | |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Communicated to Governor on April 27, 2022 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (19-Y 21-N) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB474ER) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-02 | House | VOTE: Passage (65-Y 35-N) |
2022-03-02 | House | Passed House (65-Y 35-N) |
2022-03-02 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-01 | House | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-28 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-25 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 8-N) |
2022-02-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-22 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB474S1 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22105634D-S1 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22105634D-S1 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 6-N) |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102455D |
Same As/Similar To
HB614 (Same As) 2022-05-27 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
HB614 (Same As) 2022-05-27 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
HB614 (Same As) 2022-05-27 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor