VA SB480 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0790)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0790)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public utilities; municipal utilities; disconnection of service; limitations; report; consumer protections. Suspends electric, gas, water, and wastewater utilities subject to the regulation of the State Corporation Commission from disconnecting service to a residential customer for nonpayment of bills or fees during a state of emergency declared by the Governor and provides that such suspension lasts for 30 days after such declaration of the state of emergency. The bill suspends such electric and gas utilities from disconnecting service to a residential customer for nonpayment of bills or fees when the forecasted temperature low is at or below 32 degrees Fahrenheit and suspends electric utilities from disconnecting any such customer from service when the forecasted temperature is at or above 92 degrees Fahrenheit within the 24 hours following the scheduled disconnection. The bill further suspends electric, gas, water, and wastewater utilities from disconnecting residential customers from service on Fridays, weekends, state holidays, and the day immediately preceding a state holiday. The bill requires each such utility to notify its residential customers of such utility's disconnection for nonpayment policy and to deliver notice of nonpayment of bills or fees to such customers prior to disconnection.
Title
Public utilities; municipal utilities, disconnection of service, consumer protections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (89-Y 11-N) (Y: 89 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (77-Y 21-N) (Y: 77 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (77-Y 21-N) (Y: 77 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0790) | |
2024-04-17 | House | Enacted, Chapter 790 (effective 7/1/24) |
2024-04-17 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB480ER2) |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2024-04-17 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2024-04-17 | House | VOTE: Adoption (89-Y 11-N) |
2024-04-17 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (89-Y 11-N) |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB480ER) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Title replaced 24107865D-H1 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 1-N) |
2024-02-23 | House | VOTE: Passage (77-Y 21-N) |
2024-02-23 | House | Passed House with substitute (77-Y 21-N) |
2024-02-23 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB480H1 |
2024-02-23 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24107865D-H1 |
2024-02-23 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-22 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-20 | House | Committee substitute printed 24107865D-H1 |
2024-02-20 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (17-Y 5-N) |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2024-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB480S1 |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24106532D-S1 |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24106532D-S1 |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104314D |
Same As/Similar To
HB906 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0824)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 2121.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2121.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |