VA SB545 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Conformity with Internal Revenue Code. Advances the date as of which Virginia's system of taxation conforms with the Internal Revenue Code (IRC) from December 31, 2008, to December 31, 2009, and adds two new exceptions: the deferral of certain income under §108 (i) of the IRC for taxable year 2009 is only allowed ratably through taxable year 2011 and the deferral is not allowed for taxable years other than 2009, and deconformity from the original issue discount on applicable high yield discount obligations under IRC §163 (3)(5)(f). Taxpayers are preparing and filing returns during the General Assembly Session, therefore, the bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Income tax laws; conformity to Internal Revenue Code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Committee amendment reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Committee amendment reconsidered (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Committee amendment reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Committee amendment reconsidered (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-14 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2010-02-17 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-02-17 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 10102666D-E | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB545E | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Committee amendment reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Amendment #2 by Senator Saslaw agreed to | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Amendment #3 by Senator Colgan rejected | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Amendment #1 by Senator Saslaw withdrawn | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Committee amendment rejected | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Committee amendment reconsidered (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Passed by temporarily | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/13/10 10102666D |