VA SB55 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation; disciplinary actions by regulatory boards. Requires a regulatory board under the Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation to determine the factual basis for its decisions through an informal fact-finding conference under the Administrative Process Act (?§2.2-4000 et seq.) unless the regulant and the regulatory board agree to resolve the matter through a consent order or the regulant consents to waive the conference to go directly to a formal hearing. If the conference is waived, or if it fails to dispose of the case by consent, the bill requires the regulatory board to conduct a formal hearing. The bill also provides that, if a regulant is successful in a motion to quash a subpoena duces tecum issued in furtherance of an investigation, the court shall award reasonable costs and attorney fees or $500, whichever is greater.
Title
Professional and Occupational Regulation, Department of; disciplinary actions by regulatory boards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (9-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (9-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Left in General Laws |
2018-02-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2018-02-19 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2018-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 18100229D-E |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB55E |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (9-Y 5-N 1-A) |
2017-11-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2017-11-27 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100229D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 202.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 307 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |