VA SB555 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Requires 26 affirmative votes to pass in enrolled form
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Requires 26 affirmative votes to pass in enrolled form
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Chaplains of the Virginia National Guard and Virginia Defense Force; sermons. Prohibits censorship by state government officials or agencies of the religious content of sermons made by chaplains of the Virginia National Guard while in Title 32 or State Active Duty status or of the Virginia Defense Force, so long as such content does not urge disobedience of lawful orders.
Title
Chaplains of Virginia National Guard and Virginia Defense Force; sermons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate sustained Governor's veto (24-Y 15-N) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (69-Y 29-N) (Y: 71 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 28-N) (Y: 71 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (69-Y 29-N) (Y: 71 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 28-N) (Y: 71 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Senate | Requires 26 affirmative votes to pass in enrolled form |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate sustained Governor's veto (24-Y 15-N) |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-01 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2014-03-01 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB555ER) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-02-25 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (69-Y 29-N) |
2014-02-25 | House | Passed House (69-Y 29-N) |
2014-02-25 | House | Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House |
2014-02-25 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 28-N) |
2014-02-25 | House | Passed House (69-Y 28-N) |
2014-02-25 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-24 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-21 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (16-Y 6-N) |
2014-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-18 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2014-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2014-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 14101988D |
Subjects
Armed Forces
Counties, Cities, and Towns
Military and Emergency Laws
Religious and Charitable Matters; Cemeteries
Counties, Cities, and Towns
Military and Emergency Laws
Religious and Charitable Matters; Cemeteries