VA SB61 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0190)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0190)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appointment of officers of election. Provides that if an electoral board decides to appoint substitute or additional officers of election after the appointments made by the board at its regular meeting in February, such appointments shall be made, if practicable, from lists of nominations filed by the political parties that are entitled to representation as officers. The bill also provides that, if practicable, no more than one-third of the officers appointed for each precinct may be citizens who do not represent any political party.
Title
Officers of election; appointment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0190) | |
2010-03-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 190 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB61ER) | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Passed by temporarily | |
2010-02-23 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-23 | House: Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-23 | House: Engrossed by House as amended | |
2010-02-23 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2010-02-23 | House: Read third time | |
2010-02-22 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-19 | House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-17 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Assigned P & E sub: #3 Campaign Finance | |
2010-02-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2010-02-08 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-08 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-29 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 10100881D-E | |
2010-01-29 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB61E | |
2010-01-29 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2010-01-29 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2010-01-29 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-26 | Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (11-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-04 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2010-01-04 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100881D |