VA SB630 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0253)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0253)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public safety officer; Commonwealth Public Safety Medal of Valor; dispatcher. Adds a dispatcher, including a dispatcher employed by the Department of State Police, to the definition of a public safety officer for purposes of possible selection by the Governor for the Commonwealth Public Safety Medal of Valor, presented for performance above and beyond the call of duty involving extraordinary valor in the face of grave danger, at great personal risk. A dispatcher is defined in relevant law as an individual employed by a public safety answering point, an emergency medical dispatch service provider, or both, who is qualified to answer incoming emergency telephone calls or provide for the appropriate emergency response either directly or through communication with the appropriate public safety answering point. Public safety officer; Commonwealth Public Safety Medal of Valor; dispatcher. Adds a dispatcher, including a dispatcher employed by the Department of State Police, to the definition of a public safety officer for purposes of possible selection by the Governor for the Commonwealth Public Safety Medal of Valor, presented for performance above and beyond the call of duty involving extraordinary valor in the face of grave danger, at great personal risk. A dispatcher is defined in relevant law as an individual employed by a public safety answering point, an emergency medical dispatch service provider, or both, who is qualified to answer incoming emergency telephone calls or provide for the appropriate emergency response either directly or through communication with the appropriate public safety answering point.
Title
Commonwealth Public Safety Medal of Valor; medal may be awarded to dispatcher.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0253) | |
2024-03-28 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 253 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB630ER) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-28 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-23 | House | Reported from Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2024-02-16 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-16 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB630S1 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24107571D-S1 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Committee amendments rejected |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24107571D-S1 |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101744D |