VA SB65 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-02 - Continued to 2017 in Finance (13-Y 2-N)
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-02 - Continued to 2017 in Finance (13-Y 2-N)
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Sickness and Disability Program; open enrollment period. Opens enrollment into the Virginia Sickness and Disability Program between October 1, 2016, and January 1, 2017, for eligible employees not currently participating in the program. Any employee electing to participate in the program would convert his sick leave balances to (i) additional retirement service credit on the basis of one month of service for each 173 hours of sick leave or (ii) disability credits on the basis of one hour of disability credit for each hour of sick leave. An election to participate in the program must be in writing and is irrevocable.
Title
Virginia Sickness and Disability Program; open enrollment period.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2017 in Finance (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-02 | Senate | Continued to 2017 in Finance (13-Y 2-N) |
2015-12-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-12-19 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103187D |