VA SB676 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0744)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0744)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Veterans Care Center project. Allocates and appropriates $66.7 million in aggregate of Virginia Public Building Authority bonds for the design, environmental assessments, and construction of the Hampton Roads Veterans Care Center and the Northern Virginia Veterans Care Center. The bill requires the Department of Veterans Services to provide an action plan to the Chairmen of the House Appropriations Committee and the Senate Finance Committee and to the Secretaries of Veterans and Defense Affairs and Finance prior to the allocation of any bonds. The bill also appropriates to the Department of Veterans Services anticipated federal grants for the projects.
Title
Hampton Roads Veterans Care Center; funding of project.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 0-N) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 37-N) (Y: 1 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (36-Y 1-N) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 0-N) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 37-N) (Y: 1 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (36-Y 1-N) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0744) | |
2015-04-15 | House | Enacted, Chapter 744 (effective 7/1/15) |
2015-04-15 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB676ER2) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2015-04-15 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Governor's substitute printed 15105791D-S3 |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB676ER) |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-25 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-25 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (89-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 15105474D-S2 |
2015-02-25 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2015-02-23 | House | Delegates: Cox, Jones, Joannou |
2015-02-23 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Senators: Barker, Watkins, Stosch |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | House requested conference committee |
2015-02-18 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2015-02-17 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 37-N) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (36-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-13 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-13 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB676H1 |
2015-02-13 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15105005D-H1 |
2015-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-11 | House | Committee substitute printed 15105005D-H1 |
2015-02-11 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB676S1 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104330D-S1 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104330D-S1 |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-08-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2014-08-04 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100217D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1275 (Same As) 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0720)