VA SB730 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Tabled in Appropriations (13-Y 9-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Tabled in Appropriations (13-Y 9-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Jurors; compensation. Increases the daily compensation for jurors from $30 to $50. Jurors; compensation. Increases the daily compensation for jurors from $30 to $50.
Title
Jurors; increases the daily compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - House - House: Tabled in Appropriations (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House: Tabled in Appropriations (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House: Tabled in Appropriations (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | House | Tabled in Appropriations (13-Y 9-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | Reconsidered by Appropriations |
2022-03-04 | House | Tabled in Appropriations (14-Y 8-N) |
2022-03-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-02 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-22 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 22104517D-E |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB730E |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (13-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 22104517D |