VA SB79 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 26 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-01-28 - Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (SB246-Howell) (13-Y 0-N)
Status: Introduced on December 26 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-01-28 - Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (SB246-Howell) (13-Y 0-N)
Summary
Independent examiner, records to be reviewed. Requires that the independent examiner review, at minimum, the medical records of the person who is the subject of an involuntary commitment hearing, the prescreening report, and any other relevant, readily accessible reports, records and evidence related to the person who is the subject of an involuntary commitment hearing, prior to conducting an examination. This bill also requires that the independent examiner certify at the hearing that he has reviewed the medical records of the person who is the subject of an involuntary commitment hearing, the prescreening report, and all other relevant, readily accessible reports, records and evidence related to the person who is the subject of the hearing. This bill has been incorporated into
Title
Independent examiner; records to be reviewed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-01-28 | Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (SB246-Howell) (13-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-21 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Special on Proposed Mental Health Legislation | |
2007-12-26 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2007-12-26 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 086299216 |
Same As/Similar To
SB246 (Similar To) 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0788)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB79 |