VA SB848 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0747)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0747)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Commonwealth's Twenty marksmanship award. Establishes the "Commonwealth's Twenty" marksmanship award to recognize the top 20 competitors in each of the rifle and pistol Excellence-in-Competition matches conducted at the annual Virginia State Championships conducted by the Virginia Shooting Sports Association.
Title
Commonwealth's Twenty marksmanship award; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0747) | |
2015-04-15 | House | Enacted, Chapter 747 (effective 7/1/15) |
2015-04-15 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB848ER2) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2015-04-15 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 2-N) |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2015-02-24 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/24/15 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB848ER) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-17 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-13 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2015-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100731D |