VA SJR133 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-03-03 - House: Left in Rules
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-03-03 - House: Left in Rules
Summary
Study; low-level radioactive waste; report. Requests the Department of Health to study long-term options for the disposal of low-level radioactive waste. This resolution incorporates
Title
Radioactive waste, low level; Department of Health to study long-term options for disposal thereof.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-03 | House: Left in Rules | |
2008-02-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2008-02-11 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SJ133S1 | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 087318628-S1 | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 087318628-S1 | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote | |
2008-01-24 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2008-01-24 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 088987628 | |
2008-01-24 | Senate: Unanimous consent to introduce |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SJ133 |