VA SJR72 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-14 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ72ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-14 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ72ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Stanley Schoppe and the Montross Dairy Freeze on the occasion of their 40th anniversary.
Title
Commending Stanley Schoppe and the Montross Dairy Freeze on the occasion of their 40th anniversary.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-14 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ72ER) | |
2010-01-29 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2010-01-22 | House: Laid on Speaker's table | |
2010-01-22 | House: Received | |
2010-01-21 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2010-01-21 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate | |
2010-01-20 | Senate: Introduced bill reprinted 10102484D | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and laid on Clerk's desk; offered 01/13/10 10102484D |