VA SJR73 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-14 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ73ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-14 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ73ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of the Honorable Harry Russell Potts, Jr.
Title
Celebrating the life of the Honorable Harry Russell Potts, Jr.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ73ER) |
2022-02-14 | House | Agreed to by House |
2022-02-11 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2022-02-11 | House | Received |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Presented 22103545D |