VA SJR77 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Virginia Center for School and Campus Safety; firearm safety education in the Commonwealth's public schools; report. Requests the Virginia Center for School and Campus Safety, in collaboration with the Department of Education, to study, develop, and recommend best practices for firearm safety education in the Commonwealth's public schools.
Title
Public schools; Virginia Center for School and Campus Safety to study firearm safety education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Rules (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2020-03-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-03-02 | House | Motion to refer to committee agreed to |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported from Rules (10-Y 5-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20106031D |