VA SJR77 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-07 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ77ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-07 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ77ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Spotsylvania American Legion Post 320.
Title
Commending the Spotsylvania American Legion Post 320.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ77ER) |
2022-02-07 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2022-02-04 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2022-02-04 | House | Received |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Presented 22103384D |